Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal de Thury

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Maillezais, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna

Administrator of Avignon

Note/Previous Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateEventTitle
2 May 1382AppointedBishop of Maillezais, France
12 Jul 1385AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
12 Jul 1385Elevated to Cardinal
16 Sep 1409AppointedAdministrator of Avignon, France
9 Dec 1410DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Thury
Pierre Cardinal de Thury (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Maillezais

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBresse

  • a cardinal for 25.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jul 1385
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 324, and Page 124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast