Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Annibale Cardinal Bozzuti

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Avignon, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1521³Born
15 Jun 155130.3AppointedArchbishop of Avignon, France
1562²40.9ResignedArchbishop of Avignon, France
12 Mar 156544.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 156544.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
6 Oct 156544.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Avignon, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Annibale Bozzuti
Annibale Cardinal Bozzuti (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Avignon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontecalvo Irpinio, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Death PlaceChiace, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

  • a cardinal for .5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 127
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1551, Number 23*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018