Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop François Étienne] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Vaucluse (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1763Born
8 Mar 179834.7SelectedBishop of [Vaucluse (Constitutional), France]
29 Apr 179834.8Ordained BishopBishop of [Vaucluse (Constitutional), France]
26 Oct 180138.3ResignedBishop of [Vaucluse (Constitutional), France]
25 May 183672.9DiedBishop Emeritus of [Vaucluse (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for François Étienne (VIAF: 103357059)
Bishop François Étienne (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vaucluse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvignon
Ordained BishopS. Pierre, Church, Avignon
Death PlaceOrange

  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 15 Oct 2018

Quantcast