Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Alexandre-Victor Rouanet] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Hérault (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1747Born
3 Apr 179951.7SelectedBishop of [Hérault (Constitutional), France]
10 Nov 179952.3Ordained BishopBishop of [Hérault (Constitutional), France]
16 Nov 180255.4ResignedBishop of [Hérault (Constitutional), France]
29 Jan 182173.6DiedBishop Emeritus of [Hérault (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Alexandre-Victor Rouanet (VIAF: 304060653)
Bishop Alexandre-Victor Rouanet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hérault

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLabastide-Rouairoux
Ordained BishopBéziers
Death PlaceSaint-Pons

  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1799, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast