Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Marie-Mathias Debelay

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1800BornVoiriat
3 Apr 182424.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Nov 184343.8SelectedBishop of Troyes, France
22 Jan 184443.9ConfirmedBishop of Troyes, France
10 Mar 184444.1Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
19 Oct 184848.7SelectedArchbishop of Avignon, France
11 Dec 184848.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Avignon, France
27 Sep 186363.6DiedArchbishop of Avignon, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie-Mathias Debelay:
Archbishop Jean-Marie-Mathias Debelay (born , died ) Archbishop of Avignon

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 135
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013