Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis de Vigne, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Uzs, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1558Born
18 Sep 159839.8AppointedBishop of Uzs, France
6 Dec 159840.1Ordained BishopBishop of Uzs, France
20 Nov 162062.0DiedBishop of Uzs, France

MicroData Summary for Louis de Vigne
Bishop Louis de Vigne O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Uzs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvignon, Archdiocese of Avignon
Ordained BishopCarmes, Avignon, Archdiocese of Avignon
Death PlaceAvignon, Archdiocese of Avignon

  • a bishop for 21.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 354
  • b: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1,598, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast