Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guillaume Cardinal de Mandagout, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Mar 1295AppointedArchbishop of Embrun, France
10 Apr 1295Ordained BishopArchbishop of Embrun, France
20 Apr 1295ConfirmedArchbishop of Embrun, France
26 May 1311AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
23 Dec 1312AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
23 Dec 1312Elevated to Cardinal
3 Nov 1321DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Mandagout
Guillaume Cardinal de Mandagout C.R.S.A. (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontpeyroux, France
Ordained BishopLateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France
Buried Place (Original)Sainte-Catherine, Church, Avignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 26.5 years
  • a cardinal for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Dec 1312
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 234, and Page 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 6 May 2019

Quantcast