Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre Filhol

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1438¹Born
21 Jun 150466.4AppointedBishop of Sisteron, France
9 Mar 150668.1AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
22 Jan 1541103.0DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Filhol
Archbishop Pierre Filhol (born 1438, died ) Archbishop of Aix

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 112, and Page 301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018