Catholic-Hierarchy DC

André Cardinal d’Espinay

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

Archbishop of Lyon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1451¹BornChampeaux
10 Apr 147928.3SelectedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
28 Apr 147928.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
1 Oct 148837.8AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
9 Mar 148938.2Elevated to Cardinal
23 Mar 148938.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
Oct 1499³48.8AppointedAdministrator of Aix, France
May 1500³49.3ResignedAdministrator of Aix, France
10 Nov 150049.9DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for André d’Espinay:
Cardinal André d’Espinay (died ) Archbishop of Bordeaux

  • a cardinal for 11.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Mar 1489

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013