Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Saint-Romain de Saint-Chamond

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Aix, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1523¹Born
19 Jan 155128.0AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
11 Dec 156643.9ResignedArchbishop of Aix, France
25 Jun 157855.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Aix, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Saint-Romain de Saint-Chamond
Archbishop Jean Saint-Romain de Saint-Chamond (born 1523, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Aix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArchdiocese of Lyon
Death PlaceAigues-Mortes

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 112
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1551, Number 3*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast