Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Cardinal Strozzi

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1523Born
7 Dec 154724.0AppointedBishop of Béziers, France
8 Jun 155026.5Ordained BishopBishop of Béziers, France
15 Mar 155733.2Elevated to Cardinal
20 Sep 155733.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
9 May 156137.4ResignedBishop of Béziers, France
9 May 156137.4AppointedAdministrator of Albi, France
6 Feb 156844.1AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
8 Feb 156844.1ResignedAdministrator of Albi, France
14 Dec 157148.0DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Strozzi (VIAF: 208293639)
Lorenzo Cardinal Strozzi (born , died ) Archbishop of Aix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
Ordained BishopParis, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceAvignon, Archdiocese of Avignon
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Agricol, Church, Avignon, Archdiocese of Avignon

  • a bishop for 21.5 years
  • a cardinal for 14.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1557
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 112, and Page 135
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1550, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018