Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Olivier de Pennart, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Aug 1460AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
12 Oct 1460Ordained BishopArchbishop of Aix, France
28 Jan 1484DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

MicroData Summary for Olivier de Pennart:
Archbishop Olivier de Pennart O.S.A. (died ) Archbishop of Aix

  • a bishop for 23.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 91
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,613

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013