Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Avignone Nicolai, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix, France


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Jun 1408AppointedBishop of Senez, France
13 Nov 1415AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
14 Mar 1421AppointedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
3 Jul 1422AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
15 Jun 1443DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

MicroData Summary for Avignone Nicolai
Archbishop Avignone Nicolai O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Aix

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 446, and Page 379
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 406, and Page 96
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Feb 2021

Quantcast