Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joćo d’Angoult

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix, France


Events

DateEventTitle
1378²AppointedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
1378²Ordained BishopBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
1 Jun 1379AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
19 Sep 1394DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joćo d’Angoult
Archbishop Joćo d’Angoult (died ) Archbishop of Aix

  • a bishop for 16.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 96
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast