Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Alzega (Alcega), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Coro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1555²BornAzpeitia, Spain
25 Sep 160449.7SelectedBishop of Coro, Venezuela
12 Dec 160550.9ConfirmedBishop of Coro, Venezuela
1606²51.0Ordained BishopBishop of Coro, Venezuela
13 May 161055.3DiedBishop of Coro, Venezuela

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Alzega (Alcega):
Bishop Antonio de Alzega (Alcega) O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Coro

  • a bishop for 4.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 363
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 122, Number 778

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015