Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio González de Acuña, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹BornLima, Peru
17 Nov 167040.8AppointedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
23 Nov 1670³40.8Ordained BishopBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
22 Feb 168252.1DiedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio González de Acuña:
Bishop Antonio González de Acuña O.P. (died ) Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a bishop for 11.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 409
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 10 Apr 2015