Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de la Trinidad Valera Angulo

Bishop of Guanare


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1947 BornSan Lázaro
2 Aug 197527.9Ordained PriestPriest of Trujillo, Venezuela
15 Feb 199749.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
15 Feb 199749.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Mozotcori
19 Apr 199749.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mozotcori
18 Oct 200154.1AppointedBishop of La Guaira, Venezuela
12 Oct 201164.1AppointedBishop of Guanare, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for José de la Trinidad Valera Angulo:
Bishop José de la Trinidad Valera Angulo (born ) Bishop of Guanare

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guanare.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ab: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,950
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013