Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ricardo Aldo Barreto Cairo

Auxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Titular Bishop of Badiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1968 Born
15 Aug 199830.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Guaira, Venezuela
17 Sep 201951.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
17 Sep 201951.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Badiae
23 Nov 201951.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Badiae

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Aldo Barreto Cairo
Bishop Ricardo Aldo Barreto Cairo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

EventPlace
Birth PlacePanama
Ordained BishopDon Bosco, Church, Caracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Sep 2019
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Sep 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Number 20,275

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast