Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Ramón Conde Alfonzo

Bishop Emeritus of Maracay, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1943 Born
8 Dec 196825.4Ordained PriestPriest of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
2 Dec 199552.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
2 Dec 199552.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bapara
6 Jan 199652.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bapara
21 Aug 199754.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of La Guaira, Venezuela
18 Mar 199955.6AppointedBishop of Margarita, Venezuela
12 Feb 200864.5AppointedBishop of Maracay, Venezuela
26 Apr 200864.7InstalledBishop of Maracay, Venezuela
19 Jul 201976.0RetiredBishop of Maracay, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Rafael Ramón Conde Alfonzo
Bishop Rafael Ramón Conde Alfonzo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Maracay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Maracay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,650
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast