Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco José Catalán Ocón

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1701BornTorrox
28 Mar 175755.9AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
12 Jun 175756.1Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
8 Sep 176261.3DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco José Catalán Ocón:
Bishop Francisco José Catalán Ocón (born , died ) Bishop of Urgell

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 74, Number 366

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013