Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Francisco Agustín Eura, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Orense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1684³BornBarcelona
27 Jan 173853.5AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
27 Apr 173853.8Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
11 Dec 176379.4DiedBishop of Orense, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Francisco Agustín Eura:
Bishop Ramón Francisco Agustín Eura O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Orense

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 55, Number 244
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015