Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Esteban Pérez Estremera, O.S. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Danaba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1665³BornToledo, Spain
3 Aug 172963.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Danaba
12 Nov 173065.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Danaba
5 Aug 173266.7DiedTitular Bishop of Danaba

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Miguel Esteban Pérez Estremera:
Bishop Miguel Esteban Pérez Estremera O.S. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Danaba

  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 49, Number 202
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 181

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015