Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Norbert Klemens Strotmann Hoppe, M.S.C.

Bishop of Chosica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1946 BornRiesenbeck, Germany
3 Nov 197327.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
19 Dec 199246.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
19 Dec 199246.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Caere
6 Jan 199346.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caere
11 Jan 199750.4AppointedBishop of Chosica, Peru

MicroData Summary for Norbert Klemens Strotmann Hoppe:
Bishop Norbert Klemens Strotmann Hoppe M.S.C. (born ) Bishop of Chosica

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chosica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,945
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Sep 2014