Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio de Zuloaga

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima

Note/Previous Titular See: (from bish/Ceula)


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Dec 1713AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
21 May 1714InstalledArchbishop of Lima, Peru
14 Apr 1715Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lima, Peru
21 Jan 1722DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Zuloaga:
Archbishop Antonio de Zuloaga (died ) Archbishop of Lima

  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,863
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013