Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Arguinao y Gutiérrez, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Apr 1588³BornLima
10 Sep 164658.4AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
17 Nov 164759.6Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
10 Jul 165971.2SelectedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
10 Nov 165971.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
5 Oct 167890.5DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Arguinao y Gutiérrez:
Bishop Juan de Arguinao y Gutiérrez O.P. (died ) Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 168, and Page 187
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 201
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1647, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015