Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Richard Daniel Alarcón Urrutia

Archbishop of Cuzco, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1952 Born
8 Dec 197624.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
20 Apr 199341.0IncardinatedPriest of Tarma, Peru
13 Jun 200149.1AppointedBishop of Tarma, Peru
21 Jul 200149.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tarma, Peru
28 Oct 201462.5AppointedArchbishop of Cuzco, Peru
4 Jan 201562.7InstalledArchbishop of Cuzco, Peru

MicroData Summary for Richard Daniel Alarcón Urrutia
Archbishop Richard Daniel Alarcón Urrutia (born ) Archbishop of Cuzco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cuzco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,006
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2014
  • i: CB, 7 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018