Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan de Almoguera, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1605BornCórdova, Spain
17 Feb 165954.0AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
24 Mar 166156.1Ordained BishopBishop of Arequipa, Peru
27 Nov 167368.8AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
6 May 167469.2InstalledArchbishop of Lima, Peru
2 Mar 167671.0DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Juan de Almoguera:
Archbishop Juan de Almoguera O.SS.T. (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,433
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 244
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 93
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 194, Number 1,215

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013