Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Uribe Jaramillo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sonsón-Rionegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1914BornNarińo
1 Nov 193723.7Ordained PriestPriest of Medellín, Colombia
25 Jun 196349.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cartagena, Colombia
25 Jun 196349.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
4 Aug 196349.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
6 Apr 196854.1AppointedBishop of Sonsón-Rionegro, Colombia
16 Feb 199379.0RetiredBishop of Sonsón-Rionegro, Colombia
15 Jul 199379.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Sonsón-Rionegro, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Uribe Jaramillo:
Bishop Alfonso Uribe Jaramillo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sonsón-Rionegro

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015