Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Saúl Grisales Grisales

Bishop of Ipiales, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1964 Born
12 Nov 198925.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sonsón-Rionegro, Colombia
3 Feb 201853.8AppointedBishop of Ipiales, Colombia
17 Mar 201853.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ipiales, Colombia
17 Apr 201854.0InstalledBishop of Ipiales, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Saúl Grisales Grisales
Bishop José Saúl Grisales Grisales (born ) Bishop of Ipiales

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSonsón, Diocese of Sonsón
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Chiquinquirá, Cathedral, Sonsón, Diocese of Sonsón-Rionegro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ipiales.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Feb 2018
  • i: CB, 5 Feb 2018
  • c2: CB, 25 Feb 2018
  • c34: CB, 17 Mar 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,692

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast