Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Bernardo de Peredo y Navarrete

Deceased

Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1696BornLeón
14 May 176569.1SelectedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
9 Dec 176569.6ConfirmedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
17 Aug 176670.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
22 Jun 177276.2AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
27 Jul 177276.3InstalledBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
14 Dec 177478.6DiedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

MicroData Summary for Diego Bernardo de Peredo y Navarrete:
Bishop Diego Bernardo de Peredo y Navarrete (born , died ) Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 151, and Page 448
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 8 Dec 2015