Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Santa María Benavides Velasco, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Jul 1541AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
2 Aug 1541Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
17 Jul 1550AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
21 Oct 1558AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
15 May 1560DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Santa María Benavides Velasco
Bishop Francisco de Santa María Benavides Velasco O.S.H. (died ) Bishop of Segovia

EventPlace
Birth Place
Death PlaceGuadalupe, Monastery

  • a bishop for 18.7 years

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 53, Number 289
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 154, and Page 245
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 296
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1541, Number 22*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018