Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Rodríguez de Valcárcel

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1590³Born
28 Jun 164959.0AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
4 Sep 165060.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
18 Jun 165161.0DiedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Rodríguez de Valcárcel
Bishop Francisco Rodríguez de Valcárcel (born , died ) Bishop of Cartagena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZamora, Spain

  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,423
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 137
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 180, Number 1,120
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1650, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast