Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Vega

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1560³Born
6 Oct 161453.9AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
1615²54.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
17 Jun 161655.6DiedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Vega
Bishop Pedro Vega (born , died ) Bishop of Cartagena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBubierca, Spain

  • a bishop for 1.4 years

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 137
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 132, Number 842
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast