Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Medina y Moreno

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1811Born
1843¹31.6Ordained PriestPriest of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
16 Feb 185644.7AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
14 Sep 185645.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
26 Mar 187765.8DiedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Medina y Moreno (VIAF: 305310624)
Bishop Bernardino Medina y Moreno (born , died ) Bishop of Cartagena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZotaquirá
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 186
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017