Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Almonacid

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1747BornTalayuelas
16 May 180356.1AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
24 Jul 180356.3Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
18 Sep 182174.5DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Almonacid:
Bishop Francisco Javier Almonacid (born , died ) Bishop of Palencia

  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1803, Number 18
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 296
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 124, Number 656

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015