Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Jiménez

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1742Born
31 Mar 180663.4AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
10 Aug 180663.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena (en España)
1 Dec 182078.1DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

MicroData Summary for José Jiménez
Bishop José Jiménez (born , died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHinojosa de San Vicente

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1806, Number 9
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 136
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 126, Number 670

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018