Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Antonio Garnica

Deceased

Bishop of Osma, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1747Born
23 Feb 180153.7AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
10 May 180154.0Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
10 Jan 181062.6DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Antonio Garnica
Bishop José Antonio Garnica (born , died ) Bishop of Osma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBárcena de Cicero

  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1801, Number 15
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 294
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 120, Number 633

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Apr 2017