Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Vicente Martínez y Jiménez

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1750BornTartanedo
31 Mar 180655.4AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
10 Aug 180655.8Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
22 Jul 181665.7AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
9 Feb 182372.3DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Vicente Martínez y Jiménez:
Archbishop Manuel Vicente Martínez y Jiménez (born , died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1806, Number 10
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 92, and Page 123
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 126, Number 671

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015