Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Antonio Trevilla

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1755BornRanero de Carranza
26 Jun 180549.6AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
6 Oct 180549.9Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba, Spain
15 Dec 183277.1DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Antonio Trevilla:
Bishop Pedro Antonio Trevilla (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba

  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1805, Number 30
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 163
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 125, Number 668

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015