Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Sánchez Cutanda

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1745Born
18 Dec 179752.4AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
18 Mar 179852.6Ordained BishopBishop of Huesca, Spain
28 Feb 180963.6DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Sánchez Cutanda
Bishop Joaquín Sánchez Cutanda (born , died ) Bishop of Huesca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRubielos de Mora

  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 117, Number 612
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 49
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 321

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018