Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio Pérez Hernández de Larrea

Deceased

Bishop of Valladolid


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1730BornVillar del Saz
29 Mar 180271.5AppointedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
30 May 180271.6Ordained BishopBishop of Valladolid, Spain
21 Apr 180372.5DiedBishop of Valladolid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Pérez Hernández de Larrea:
Bishop Juan Antonio Pérez Hernández de Larrea (born , died ) Bishop of Valladolid

  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,602
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 387
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 122, Number 644
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015