Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardo José Andrés Vázquez Parga, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1747Born
18 Dec 176518.0ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
3 Aug 180759.6AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
22 Nov 180759.9Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
16 Sep 182173.7DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gerardo José Andrés Vázquez Parga
Bishop Gerardo José Andrés Vázquez Parga O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Salamanca

EventPlace
Birth PlacePacios

  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1807, Number 19
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 329
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1700, Page 127, Number 677

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018