Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Buenaventura Moyano Rodríguez

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1755Born
22 Dec 180045.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
22 Dec 180045.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Thracia
26 Dec 180045.4SelectedBishop of Palencia, Spain
1 Feb 180145.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Thracia
23 Feb 180145.6ConfirmedBishop of Palencia, Spain
7 Sep 180247.1DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Buenaventura Moyano Rodríguez
Bishop Buenaventura Moyano Rodríguez (born , died ) Bishop of Palencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSerrada

  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,801, Number 7
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 296, and Page 338
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1,700, Page 119, Number 630

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast