Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Palafox y Croy de Abre

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1740Born
20 Oct 180060.3AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
1 Feb 180160.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Spain
9 Dec 180262.4DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Palafox y Croy de Abre
Bishop Antonio Palafox y Croy de Abre (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,801, Number 5
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 159
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 119, Number 629

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast