Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Cavia y González

Deceased

Bishop of Osma, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1761Born
19 Aug 181452.8SelectedBishop of Osma, Spain
26 Sep 181452.9ConfirmedBishop of Osma, Spain
27 Dec 181453.1Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
23 Dec 183170.1DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Cavia y González
Bishop Juan de Cavia y González (born , died ) Bishop of Osma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAstudillo

  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1814, Number 12
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 294
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 129, Number 692

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018