Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Ramón de Espinosa y Lorenzo, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mérida, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1735Born
18 Dec 179560.3AppointedBishop of Mérida, Venezuela
21 Feb 179660.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mérida, Venezuela
23 Sep 180065.0DiedBishop of Mérida, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ramón de Espinosa y Lorenzo
Bishop Antonio Ramón de Espinosa y Lorenzo O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Mérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCervera de la Cañada, Spain
Ordained BishopMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 114, Number 596
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 2
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 208
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast