Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Isidoro Gutiérrez Vigil

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1730Born
11 Apr 179160.9AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
24 Jul 179161.2Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
13 Oct 180575.4DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Isidoro Gutiérrez Vigil
Bishop Francisco Isidoro Gutiérrez Vigil (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuertahernando

  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 109, Number 568
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 104
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018