Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ildefonso Molina y Santaella

Deceased

Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1733BornArjona
17 Feb 178349.1AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
17 Aug 178349.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
4 Dec 178450.9DiedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ildefonso Molina y Santaella:
Bishop Ildefonso Molina y Santaella (born , died ) Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo

  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,546
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 99, Number 516
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 166

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016