Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santiago Palmero Escada

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1726Born
11 Dec 178054.9AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
18 Feb 178155.1Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
10 Dec 178155.9DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Santiago Palmero Escada
Bishop Santiago Palmero Escada (born , died ) Bishop of Badajoz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillanueva del Campo

  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,628
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 98, Number 506
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018