Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pedro Benito Antonio Cardinal Quevedo y Quintano

Deceased

Bishop of Orense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1736BornVillanueva del Fresno
22 Mar 176024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salamanca, Spain
15 Apr 177640.3AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
14 Jul 177640.5Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
8 Mar 181680.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
23 Sep 181680.7Elevated to Cardinal
28 Mar 181882.2DiedBishop of Orense, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Benito Antonio Quevedo y Quintano:
Cardinal Pedro Benito Antonio Quevedo y Quintano (born , died ) Bishop of Orense

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
  • a cardinal for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Mar 1816
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 93, Number 477

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013